OUNDLE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an association run by parents and teachers of Oundle Primary School. We raise money through events held locally which are run by parents and teachers of the school. Examples of events held are an Auction of Promises and a Christmas Fair.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,132
Total expenditure: £6,355

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OUNDLE PSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Jackson Chair 18 October 2021
None on record
Christopher David Sheldon Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Samantha Palmer-Sheldon Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.99k £10.64k £10.66k £10.76k £7.13k
Total expenditure £10.88k £5.36k £6.51k £24.62k £6.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Oundle C Of E Primary School
Cotterstock Road
Oundle
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5HA
Phone:
01832272322