Financial history PENMAEN AND NICHOLASTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1081661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.43k £1.15k £3.96k £8.38k £8.62k
Total expenditure £6.66k £1.69k £3.08k £6.19k £9.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A