Trustees PENMAEN AND NICHOLASTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1081661

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dale Edward Ponting | Chair | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
claire Cotter | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Brian Martin | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annzella Jane Gregg | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Williams | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cody Bates | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Ponting | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Sophie Kett-White | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PATTON | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HILL | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JERRY KINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.