YAPTON FREE CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yapton Free Church exists to share the good news of Jesus with the local community and surrounding areas, through words & actions. We proclaim the Gospel through church meetings, local outreach, (inc: schools work, youth groups, parent/toddler, children's work, Alpha course & conferences. We also believe the gospel is love in action & also support communities in South Africa, Nepal, Mongolia, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 March 2000: Standard registration
- 13 May 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 13 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1184673 YAPTON FREE CHURCH
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.25k | £156.51k | £135.87k | £143.41k | £203.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.87k | £123.48k | £119.32k | £139.68k | £196.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 22 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 22 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN YAPTON, WEST SUSSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID YAPTON, WEST SUSSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID YAPTON, WEST SUSSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
YAPTON, WEST SUSSEX, AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window