Governing document THE COMMONWEALTH INSTITUTE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH MARCH 1999 AMENDED 23RD JULY 2003 AND 8 DECEMBER 2005, 27 JANUARY 2006 AND 19 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THE COMMONWEALTH; AND (B) TO PROMOTE INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE IN THE COMMONWEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR, THE PROMOTION OF EXHIBITIONS AND INFORMATION SERVICES, WHETHER PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY, ILLUSTRATING ALL OR ANY ASPECTS OF THE COMMONWEALTH AND THE LIFE OF ITS PEOPLES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.