CHANCTONBURY PLAYSCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the playschool shall be to advance the education of children below compulsory school age in Washington, Ashington and the surrounding area by: 1. Providing safe and satisfactory group play in which parents have the right to take part 2. Encourage other charitable activities through which parents may help their children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 February 2000: Standard registration
- 05 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- WASHINGTON PLAYSCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.30k | £46.62k | £55.09k | £55.89k | £44.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.33k | £50.91k | £50.32k | £50.72k | £40.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £41.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 1999 AMENDED ON 24 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN WASHINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREA BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFACTORY GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART; AND (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN
Area of benefit
ASHINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window