THE MICHAEL MATTHEWS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants to childrens charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tanzania
Governance
- 22 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN KILKENNY OBE | Trustee | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
SPENCER GEORGE MATTHEWS | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SPENCER MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.05k | £32.70k | £28.68k | £46.26k | £72.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.58k | £34.46k | £13.08k | £118.20k | £54.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES (THE 'CHARITABLE PURPOSES') AS SUCH TERM IS DEFINED BELOW IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DECLARATION OF TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Derby Street
London
W1J 7AD
- Phone:
- 02070791621
- Website:
-
michaelmatthewsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.