THE CROWCOMBE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Crowcombe Hall provides a building and open space for local people to participate in recreational and leisure activities and to hold functions. The hall is available for hire and has rooms to accomodate small and large groups. There is a well equipped kitchen and changing facilities for sports' teams.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 July 2001: Standard registration
- THE CROWCOMBE HALL (Working name)
- CROWCOMBE RECREATION AND COMMUNITY HALL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS STANILAND | Chair | 12 September 2000 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Staniland | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Davis | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Sydney Benjamin Baker | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Bell | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Newton Barker | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Martin-Vigor | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Kennedy | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Terry John Hughes | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mariele Grace Smith | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS JAN LOCK | Trustee | 12 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL BROWN | Trustee | 03 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL CLAIRE TROLLOPE-BELLEW | Trustee | 12 September 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.81k | £17.68k | £27.25k | £16.02k | £14.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.42k | £19.82k | £29.15k | £20.31k | £14.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.52k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/07/2001 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2015 as amended on 09 Mar 2023 as amended on 02 May 2024 as amended on 06 Mar 2025 as amended on 06 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE LEASEHOLD LAND BEING APART OF THE KESTEVEN GROUND TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER PROPERTY AS MAY BE ACQUIRED BY THE TRUSTEES (HEREINAFTER CALL 'THE TRUST PROPERTY') SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION AND COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CROWCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE, THE PARISH OF CROWCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEATHERLEA
CROWCOMBE
TAUNTON
TA4 4AE
- Phone:
- 01984618318
- Email:
- gillhlcs@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window