Governing document THE VEGAN-ORGANIC NETWORK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES OF VEGAN-ORGANIC HORTICULTURE AND AGRICULTURE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO SUCH HORTICULTURE AND AGRICULTURE AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.