Financial history COTTONTAILS

Charity number: 1078850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £45.21k £127.64k £9.09k £6.28k £4.75k
Total expenditure £15.69k £11.75k £11.95k £11.87k £12.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A