KANTER JULES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of religion & education & relief to the aged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON KANTER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JEREMY QUENTIN KANTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.88k | £15.13k | £17.50k | £18.26k | £157.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.82k | £23.78k | £16.07k | £21.45k | £115.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 05/01/00
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR JEWISH RELIGION IN ORDER TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION OR EDIFICATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD 2. THE RELIEF OF AGED, IMPOTENT AND IMPOVERISHED PERSONS OF ALL AGES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING GIFTS FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT AND/OR SUPPORT OF SCHOOLS OF LEARNING GENERALLY AND THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF COLLEGES AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 QUEENS GARDENS
LONDON
NW4 2TR
- Phone:
- 01273321956
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window