PARENTS AUTISM CAMPAIGN FOR EDUCATION ( PACE )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 June 2000: Standard registration
- 26 October 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 26 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1063184 AMBITIOUS ABOUT AUTISM
- PACE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF DISTRESS CAUSED TO CHILDREN WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, POLICY MAKERS AND OPINION-FORMERS ABOUT THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window