TELFORD CHRISTIANS TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TCT supports Borough churches in their shared mission to work together more effectively. This is both by facilitating ecumenical partnerships and collaborative working with other organisations to address marginalisation and poverty in the Borough. This includes a partner Stay, providing housing for vulnerable young people, and providing industrial chaplains.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 07 December 2000: Standard registration
- 06 December 2012: Funds received from 703017 TELFORD TOWN CENTRE CHRISTIAN TRUST
- TELFORD CHRISTIAN COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alan Howard Walden | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev LESLIE BURKE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Ann Osmund-Smith | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Rev Matthew William Lefroy | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.00k | £74.49k | £73.73k | £1.64m | £37.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.56k | £65.88k | £74.70k | £1.63m | £32.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £436.82k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.60m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.63m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £177.87k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF THE CHARITY SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE ATTACHED TO THIS MEMORANDUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEETING POINT HOUSE
SOUTHWATER SQUARE
TELFORD
SHROPSHIRE
TF3 4HS
- Phone:
- 01952291904
- Email:
- info@staytelford.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window