AHIMSA FOR QUALITY OF LIFE ( AQL )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are planning Health and Well-being training projects in the UK and also projects for the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in Africa and India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
Governance
- 27 April 2000: Standard registration
- AQL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NATVARLAL KESHAVLAL SHAH MBE | Chair |
|
||||||||||
DIPAK SHAH | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ANANTRAY KHIMCHAND MEHTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.38k | £955 | £845 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | £5.24k | £235 | £160 | £255 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2024 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA, WHICH OBJECTS MAY INCLUDE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, BY MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING FUNDS FOR PROJECTS WHICH TRUSTEES SHALL AGREE TO SUPPORT AND IN OTHER SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 JAMES CLOSE
WOODLANDS
LONDON
NW11 9QX
- Phone:
- 02084555573
- Email:
- info@jainnetwork.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window