ROMSEY AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lectures and study groups on a wide range of educational topics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
68 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 September 2000: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 December 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Edith May Meyer | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rosemary Saltrick | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elizabeth Blakeman | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Goodwin Shemilt | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Wilks | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Tudball | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Marchbank | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Holmes | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Meredith | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.86k | £10.91k | £20.12k | £20.46k | £27.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.23k | £8.16k | £19.71k | £8.49k | £6.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 30 Mar 2022 as amended on 30 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
3. Object The charity’s objective (‘the Object’) is the advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning, and personal development in Romsey and the surrounding areas
Area of benefit
ROMSEY AND ITS SURROUNDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Windfield Drive
ROMSEY
Hampshire
SO51 7RL
- Phone:
- 01794517589
- Email:
- secretary@romseyu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window