THE ALTON COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To award scholarships and development grants to stimulate, encourage and reward excellence amongst 6th Form students at Alton College, Hampshire. To provide equipment for Alton College that can not be funded by Government.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Andreae | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Niven Baird | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Wilson | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR HELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BAKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MERRY FRANKEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.46k | £21.65k | £20.23k | £20.58k | £25.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.58k | £21.78k | £23.64k | £24.07k | £23.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ATTENDING ALTON COLLEGE ("THE COLLEGE") BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO GIFTS GRANTS LOANS SCHOLARSHIPS BURSARIES AND PRIZES NOT USUALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; AND B) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CONNECTED WITH THE COLLEGE AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY ("THE DIRECTORS") SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ALTON & GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD ODIHAM ROAD
ALTON
HAMPSHIRE
GU34 2LY
- Phone:
- 01420592208
- Email:
- SARAH.WOMERSLEY@HSDC.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window