THE STUBBS BLINKHORN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PERSONAL TO SETTLOR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 May 2000: Standard registration
- THE ROBERT AND VALERIE BLINKHORN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brachers Trust Corporation Limited | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Kim Bannister | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £463 | £367 | £1.76k | £2.12k | £2.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £2.71k | £1.66k | £4.99k | £5.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF (INCLUDING ANY INCOME ACCRUING OR ACCRUED BUT NOT RECEIVED AT THE DATE OF SETTLEMENT) UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND (IF AND SO OFTEN AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT) THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATION IN MUSIC THROUGH THE TRAINING OF PEOPLE TO ACHIEVE HIGHER STANDARDS OF EXCELLENCE AND THROUGH ITS PERFORMANCE AND APPRECIATION AND ALSO TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING CONTAINED HEREIN SHALL AUTHORISE THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND OR THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS AFORESAID SAVE THOSE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE U.K
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRACHERS SOLICITORS
57-59 LONDON ROAD
MAIDSTONE
ME16 8JH
- Phone:
- 01622690691
- Email:
- AngelaJarvis@brachers.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window