Financial history KINGS FOR CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1081395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £42.43k £28.14k £20.96k £15.82k £26.19k
Total expenditure £45.80k £25.37k £24.46k £18.37k £23.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A