SLEAFORD CONCERT BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Concert band providing training in instrumental playing for people of any level of performing experience in our rural area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Clarke | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Leake | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Richards | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Stuart Hymers | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Fuller | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Jackson | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Riggall | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.97k | £5.49k | £8.15k | £6.94k | £8.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.98k | £8.63k | £6.51k | £7.68k | £6.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 2000 as amended on 04 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION IN - AND THE APPRECIATION OF - THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ASPECTS AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND TRAINING COURSES FOR PERSONS WISHING TO STUDY AND PLAY MUSIC AS PART OF A BAND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Highfield Close
Osbournby
SLEAFORD
Lincolnshire
NG34 0EW
- Phone:
- 07388534571
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window