Financial history THE ENGLISH BUDDHIST MONASTERY TRUST

Charity number: 1088804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £435 £176 £9 £88 £217
Total expenditure £1.26k £756 £603 £1.01k £846
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A