NATWEST SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to help local community groups through, for example, the provision of loans to Social Enterprises, charities, not-for-profit organisations & Responsible Finance providers. Our mission is to create positive change for vulnerable & disadvantaged groups across the United Kingdom through the provision of finance to viable social ventures that have been refused traditional bank lending
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,877,725
Donations and legacies | £1.67m | |
Charitable activities | £131.53k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £75.08k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£309,877
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £309.88k | |
Other | £0 |
£360,039 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £309.88k | |
Retained for future use | £1.57m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £309.88k | |
Retained for future use | £1.93m |
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 February 2000: Standard registration
- NATWEST SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL (Working name)
- ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL (Working name)
- ULSTER BANK SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL (Working name)
- NATWEST COMMUNITY FINANCE FUND - THE WEST MIDLANDS (Previous name)
- RBS GROUP MICRO FINANCE FUNDS (Previous name)
- RBS SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Lynn Anderson | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anshu Mandal | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Meek | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DIXON | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Parita Doshi | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ash Mohammed | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harrison | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN PAUL FRASER SMITH | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.93k | £320.74k | £267.83k | £245.88k | £1.88m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.30k | £1.68m | £346.37k | £220.71k | £309.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £131.53k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £75.08k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £309.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.32m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.40m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2017 as amended on 21 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Dec 2020 as amended on 29 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE WITH A PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON PROVIDING FLEXIBLE FINANCE AND SUPPORT WITH FUNDING APPLICATIONS. THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, SCOTLAND AND WALES AND SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AS SHALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE, HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, WARWICKSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF STOKE-ON-TRENT, WOLVERHAMPTON, WASALL, SANDWELL, DUDLEY, BIRMINGHAM, SOLIHULL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
250 BISHOPSGATE
LONDON
EC2M 4AA
- Phone:
- 02076721411
- Email:
- natwestscc@natwest.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window