Financial history ABERDEEN PARK NURSERY

Charity number: 1116160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £501.16k £428.39k £455.18k £464.92k £527.73k
Total expenditure £434.74k £399.02k £423.02k £437.42k £434.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £130.95k £162.82k £118.41k £130.75k £115.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £14.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £512.38k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £501.16k N/A N/A N/A £454
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £434.74k N/A N/A N/A £434.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.30k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0