THE INTERNATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR THE CONSERVATION OF THE INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE (TICCIH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TICCIH IS THE ONLY INTERNATIONAL VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION DEVOTED TO THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, INTERPRETATION AND PROMOTION OF THE INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE. IT HAS A RECIPROCAL AGREEMENT WITH ICOMOS, THE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL ON MONUMENTS AND SITES, TO ADVISE ON INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE SITES AND IS ACTIVELY CONCERNED WITH THE PROMOTION OF WORLD HERITAGE SITES OF AN INDUSTRIAL NATURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Hungary
- India
- Iran
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Malta
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Turkey
- United States
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
Governance
- 10 March 2000: Standard registration
- TICCIH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Carolina Castaneda Lopez | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leonor Amarilis Placido de Medeiros | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moulshri Joshi | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bode Morin | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jose Manuel Morais Lopes Cordeiro | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucie Morisset | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marion Steiner | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Florence Hachez-Leroy | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROF DR HELMUTH ALBRECHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAG AVANGO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAIN MALCOLM STUART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MASSIMO PREITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HSIAO-WEI LIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £13.40k | £9.58k | £10.98k | £7.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.23k | £12.81k | £6.06k | £12.46k | £7.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 January 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION OF PEOPLE IN SAFEGUARDING CONSERVING INVESTIGATING DOCUMENTING AND RESEARCHING ALL ASPECTS OF THE INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TICCIH
c/o Miles K. Oglethorpe
6 Summerside Street
EDINBURGH
EH6 4NU
- Phone:
- 0131 554 3317
- Email:
- secretary@ticcih.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window