Financial history NORTHERN ROOTS

Charity number: 1088823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £134.54k £117.57k £227.76k £153.59k £155.73k
Total expenditure £138.53k £77.98k £160.18k £200.46k £127.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.68k £9.19k £26.32k N/A N/A