ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION OXFORD AND DISTRICT
Charity Number: 1078921
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare services for past and present members of the Royal Air Forces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Total income: £7,174
Total expenditure: £8,156
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Oxfordshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 January 2000: Standard registration
- 23 July 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1078939 Royal Air Forces Association Wantage and Oxford Ba...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.20k | £550 | £5.05k | £2.49k | £7.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.33k | £1.03k | £4.78k | £3.63k | £8.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 05 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 10 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 05 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 05 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 26/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28/05/1997
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA (226686)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
OXFORD & DISTRICT, OXFORDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window