Trustees ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION MANSFIELD BRANCH
Charity Number: 1078936

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Hughes | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Drew | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HALLGARTH | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH RICHARDSON | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BERNARD GREGORY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.