AGE CONCERN GILLINGHAM

Charity Number: 1079572
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the charity is to promote the relief of older people in Gillingham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £43,954
Total expenditure: £53,561

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr GILLIAN FARGHER Chair 15 April 2020
THE FRENCH HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Francois Contreiras Trustee 12 December 2024
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
LYNN ELIZABETH FERGUSON Trustee 10 August 2023
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Paul Victor Andrews Trustee 16 June 2022
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Julia Burton-Jones Trustee 13 October 2017
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
ALAN JOHN BATES Trustee 09 August 2012
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
ANN WEST Trustee
THE NET COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
SUSAN MARY ROBINSON Trustee
Age UK Kent Rivers
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £57.21k £57.15k £20.69k £40.94k £43.95k
Total expenditure £50.75k £51.94k £28.09k £56.43k £53.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.19k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Age UK Kent Rivers
Floor 2
Fitted Rigging House South
Anchor Wharf
The Historic Dockyard
Chatham
Phone:
01634 572616