THE PROJECT CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations are made for general charitable purposes to provide for the general public/mankind. Grants are made to organisations and research bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sequent (U.K.) Limited | Trustee | 24 October 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £501 | £540 | £57 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.08k | £359.41k | £19.84k | £18.16k | £45.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST FOR SUCH PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 King William Street
London
EC4N 7AF
- Phone:
- 01481881003
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window