CHARIS CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a. Ministering every week to the spiritual needs of the people through bible study,prayer meetings, counselling sessions and healing meetings. b. Core Church events for the year included Women's Retreat, Youth Celebration Service, Be Healed Convention and the International day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 May 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 14 July 2000: Standard registration
- 25 October 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 October 2011: Funds transferred to 1131271 CHARIS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 15/05/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.62k | £213.18k | £362.26k | £264.58k | £98.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.81k | £216.52k | £225.56k | £237.26k | £79.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2009 | 31 October 2010 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2009 | 28 October 2010 | 227 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 28 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 28 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1999, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTARY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING, OPERATING OR SUPPORTING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window