ORCHARD 2000 FOLKINGHAM MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A green open space within the village to be used by all for recreation and enjoyment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 May 2001: Standard registration
- ORCHARD 2000 (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CANDIDA BALL | Chair | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wright | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Toft | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irenee Chappell | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Smith | Trustee | 26 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ball | Trustee | 26 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £1.48k | £3.28k | £2.79k | £3.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £608 | £2.04k | £3.23k | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2024 | 729 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 SEPTEMBER AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 5 JANUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS A MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
FOLKINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring Farmhouse
Spring Lane
Folkingham
SLEAFORD
Lincolnshire
NG34 0SJ
- Phone:
- 07786731928
- Email:
- cjiaball@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window