AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE & RUTLAND HOME HELP LIMITED

Charity number: 1086862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of services to older or disadvantaged people in their homes. Providing personal care, cleaning, shopping, foot care, well being and other essential services that enables them to remain independent and living in the community. Provision of care in Extra Care Developments.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AGE CONCERN LEICESTERSHIRE HOMEHELP (Working name)
  • AGE CONCERN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND (SPECIAL HOMECARE) LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM ANDREW FRANK SMITH Chair 21 August 2013
None on record
Joanne Kavanagh Trustee 08 March 2023
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
Sean Patrik Moran Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Mark Evan Jones Trustee 14 September 2022
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
Navin Parmar Trustee 14 September 2022
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
Peter Parsons Trustee 09 September 2020
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND(MEASHAM)
Received: On time
DR Peter George Neville Trustee 25 September 2014
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND(MEASHAM)
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER THOMAS SAUL Trustee
THE MANSION TRUST (UK )
Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CONSANGUINITARIUM
Received: On time
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY
Received: On time
BARBARA MARY FREESTONE Trustee
AGE UK LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND(MEASHAM)
Received: On time
MALCOLM LINDSEY Trustee
AGE UK LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND(MEASHAM)
Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
PAUL RICHARDS Trustee
AGE UK LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND(MEASHAM)
Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED
Received: On time
SIMON LINDLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.12m £1.07m £1.03m £1.10m £1.17m
Total expenditure £1.08m £1.06m £1.05m £1.10m £1.17m
Income from government contracts £204.19k £15.88k £91.54k £45.35k £33.95k
Income from government grants N/A £297.30k £109.16k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.45k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £114.71k £707.15k £907.87k £1.06m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £361.55k £124.85k £39.68k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.06m £1.05m £1.10m £1.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.18k £3.03k £2.76k £1.67k £1.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £123.90k £119.55k £111.14k £153.99k £304.78k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £112.31k £101.12k £110.98k £153.23k £302.49k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lansdowne House
113 Princess Road East
Leicester
Leicester
Midlands
LE1 7LA
Phone:
0116 2992233