Accounts and annual returns HEXTABLE SCHOOL EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1079279
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 31 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2010 21 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required