Financial history FFLAG

Charity number: 1079918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.30k £32.14k £41.33k £30.11k £45.44k
Total expenditure £7.14k £4.97k £5.92k £28.32k £45.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A