CHELMSFORD AGENCY FOR VOLUNTEERING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increase the number of volunteering opportunities and enable all who wish to volunteer to do so for the benefit of the community of the Borough Chelmsford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 11 February 2000: Standard registration
- 25 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAV (Working name)
- VOLUNTEER CENTRE CHELMSFORD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.81k | £203.84k | £193.09k | £138.10k | £135.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.54k | £201.05k | £189.50k | £160.43k | £145.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 16 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 04 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHELMSFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, PROTECT HEALTH, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window