INDIAN CHRISTIAN WELFARE ORGANISAITON (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping Children/Young, elderly, people with disabilities & people of a particular ethnic or racial origin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 20 September 2000: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1089464 CANCER RESEARCH UK
- ITHE INDIAN CHRISTIAN WELFARE AND HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- THE INDIAN CHRISTIAN WELFARE AND HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANISATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14k | £1.16k | £967 | £320 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £109 | £200 | £12.22k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED 18TH MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHRISTIANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window