SKILLS FOR CARE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to develop the adult social care workforce to provide quality social care services. We do this by: developing national occupational standards and qualification frameworks; collecting and analysing workforce information and other research; implementing our national workforce development strategy for all areas of the workforce; creating employer-led workforce development infrastructures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£41,940,367
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £37.43m | |
Other trading activities | £2.25m | |
Investments | £43.69k | |
Other | £2.22m |
Total expenditure:
£42,352,181
Raising funds | £1.31m | |
Charitable activities | £39.03m | |
Other | £2.01m |
£3,282,932 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £9,127,300 from 11 government contract(s) and £27,861,284 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £39.03m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £39.03m | |
Retained for future use | £2.87m |
People

213 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 23 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 6 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 March 2000: Standard registration
- 01 February 2017: Funds received from 1131969 NATIONAL SKILLS ACADEMY FOR SOCIAL CARE
- SKILLS FOR CARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Joseph Coughlan | Chair | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Beverley Felicia Tarka | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Chambers | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Fell | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naser Ulmulk Irteza Turabi | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Bullion | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Day | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Lawrence Ward | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzie Bailey | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.85m | £36.17m | £38.55m | £35.32m | £41.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.19m | £35.34m | £37.85m | £35.28m | £42.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.20m | £6.76m | £7.59m | £8.75m | £9.13m | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.96m | £27.13m | £28.22m | £22.69m | £27.86m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.58m | £1.39m | £1.79m | £2.31m | £2.25m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £33.16m | £33.96m | £35.89m | £31.73m | £37.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £24.09k | £3.49k | £389 | £15.94k | £43.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.09m | £813.07k | £876.97k | £1.26m | £2.22m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £33.37m | £33.95m | £36.99m | £32.88m | £39.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.45m | £845.03k | £857.54k | £1.14m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £113.95k | £138.54k | £140.09k | £155.29k | £194.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £17.14m | £18.41m | £20.26m | £18.10m | £21.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £3.38k | £3.54k | £3.72k | £3.91k | £4.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.37m | £550.00k | £5.00k | £1.26m | £2.01m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.24m | £4.53m | £4.52m | £4.57m | £4.36m | |
|
Long-term investments | £28.07m | £32.02m | £35.13m | £33.53m | £36.81m | |
|
Other assets | £12.26m | £12.46m | £16.57m | £14.61m | £15.76m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£7.75m | -£8.62m | -£487.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £10.20m | £10.08m | £14.35m | £12.27m | £13.63m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 24 Oct 2018 as amended on 14 Oct 2020 as amended on 12 Oct 2022 as amended on 27 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO HELP, SUPPORT AND ASSIST CARE SERVICE USERS AND TO IMPROVE STANDARDS OF SOCIAL CARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO: I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE ORGANISATION, PROMOTION OR PROVISION OF TRAINING TO PEOPLE (EMPLOYED OR VOLUNTEERS) ENGAGED OR TO BE ENGAGED IN WORKING WITH SOCIAL CARE USERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. II) TO GIVE PARTICULAR ATTENTION TO THE WORKFORCE AND SKILL DEVELOPMENT NEEDS OF ALL ORGANISATIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, INDIVIDUALS WORKING IN THE SECTOR III) TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF EMPLOYMENT EDUCATION AND TRAINING AGENDAS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH AND PROMOTE THE USE OF RELEVANT NATIONAL OCCUPATIONAL STANDARDS. IV) JOINTLY, WITH SOME OR ALL OF CENTRAL AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, INDUSTRY BODIES, OTHER SECTOR SKILLS COUNCILS AND ALL RELEVANT EMPLOYERS AND STAFF GROUPS TO WORK ON STRATEGIES AND PROJECTS REGARDING: A) THE IMPACT OF LEGISLATION AND OTHER REGULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL, NATIONAL OR EUROPEAN POLICIES ON THE SECTOR'S WORKFORCE; B) THE OPPORTUNITIES FOR CAREER DEVELOPMENT, LEADERSHIP, RECRUITMENT AND SKILL SHORTAGES; AND C) THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF A WORKFORCE TRAINING STRATEGY LINKED TO THE NEEDS OF THE SECTOR AND BASED ON AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE PRESENT AND FUTURE COMPETENCE NEEDS IN THESE OBJECTS, "SOCIAL CARE USERS", ARE THOSE PEOPLE IN NEED OF CARE AND SUPPORT BECAUSE OF OLD AGE, YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE "SECTOR" MEANS COLLECTIVELY PEOPLE, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WORKING WITH SOCIAL CARE USERS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
SKILLS FOR CARE
WEST GATE
6 GRACE STREET
LEEDS
LS1 2RP
- Phone:
- 01132451716
- Email:
- info@skillsforcare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window