Financial history SARACENS SPORT FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1079316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £952.14k £1.01m £1.12m £1.37m £1.48m
Total expenditure £978.99k £892.44k £1.11m £1.34m £1.48m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.45k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.00k £55.29k £53.14k £72.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £303.55k £447.98k £328.50k £298.30k £288.07k
Income - Other trading activities £74.92k £26.25k £140.79k £144.74k £142.58k
Income - Charitable activities £573.67k £443.48k £648.89k £927.44k £1.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £91.55k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £5.70k £0 £0 £1.58k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £751.89k £701.17k £883.65k £1.18m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £227.10k £191.27k £230.78k £165.20k £154.86k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.80k £10.20k £11.10k £11.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0