Financial history FRIENDS OF WOODCHURCH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.23k £8.21k £1.18k £1.64k £2.53k
Total expenditure £6.70k £15.57k £1.13k £5.79k £589
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A