FRIENDS OF WOODCHURCH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide funds for various purposes within Woodchurch Primary School (in consultation with the Headteacher). Such purposes may typically include the provision of equipment for the school, and outings and entertainment for the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 31 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raffaela Gregor | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Macfarlane | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer DAWES | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Ann-Marie Hall | Trustee | 01 September 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.21k | £1.18k | £1.64k | £2.53k | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.57k | £1.13k | £5.79k | £589 | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
WOODCHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodchurch C of E Primary School
Bethersden Road
Woodchurch
Ashford
TN26 3QJ
- Phone:
- 01233 860232
- Email:
- fowsa@woodchurch.kent.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window