THE FEDERATION OF BLACK & ASIAN DRUG & ALCHOHOL WORKERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2001: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- FBADAW (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 9 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS (IN PARTICULAR PERSONS FROM VISIBLE MINORITIES WHICH MAY INCLUDE PERSONS OF AFRICAN, CARIBBEAN OR ASIAN ORIGIN) WHO ARE AFFECTED BY OR DEPENDENT ON DRUGS, ALCOHOL AND OTHER PSYCHOACTIVE SUBSTANCES AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH (IN PARTICULAR THE HEALTH OF PERSONS FROM VISIBLE MINORITIES) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE CONCERNING DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window