AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides advocacy / advice and information. Acts as an umbrella resource. Holds cultural events. Address inequalities within service provision. Carries out community development activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 24 August 2005: Standard registration
- ACCDF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MINISTER DAVID CAMPBELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE BURNETT | Trustee | 05 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROY WASHINGTON FEARON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AARON ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA MARKLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £7.55k | £35.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £7.55k | £22.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LUTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF AFRICAN OR CARIBBEAN ORIGIN AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING. (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
LUTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 ALESIA ROAD
LUTON
BEDFORDSHIRE
UK
LU3 3QH
- Phone:
- 07460533454
- Email:
- INFO@ACCDF.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window