Financial history PAKISTAN MUSLIM ASSOCIATION NEWCASTLE CENTRAL MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE (BILAL JAMIA MASJID)

Charity number: 1084434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £134.87k £150.12k £216.38k £229.25k £376.61k
Total expenditure £183.86k £156.27k £201.64k £250.46k £261.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.78k N/A £10.11k N/A