FRIENDS OF THE DISCIPLES OF CHRIST (F.O.D.O.C.)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to support welfare work in India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 24 August 2000: Standard registration
- 20 December 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FODOC (Working name)
- KHAMMAM CHILDRENS HOME (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.29k | £11.95k | £11.02k | £10.28k | £5.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.20k | £7.21k | £5.41k | £7.96k | £3.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN INDIA THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN INDIA AND IN PARTICULARLY, THE YOUNG, ELDERLY, SICK AND POOR WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCESE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window