LET'S GO STROKE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lets Go Stroke Club is a social club where stroke survivors, their families and friends can meet every month, to make new friends and support each other. Stroke can be a devastating condition and we aim to reach not only the sufferer but to engage with their families and carers to help them cope with the relentless stress of caring for their loved ones. We are totally run by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Halton
- St Helens
- Warrington
Governance
- 21 March 2000: Standard registration
- LETS GO CLUB (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Veronica Cook | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Mike Duncan | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rigby | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Cook | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Byrne | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Ryder | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.05k | £12.90k | £28.28k | £11.00k | £12.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.02k | £7.33k | £11.08k | £19.00k | £14.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | £5.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2000 AMENDED 8 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL PERSONS IN THE BOROUGH OF HALTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A STROKE AND THEIR DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HALTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Brookfield Avenue
RUNCORN
Cheshire
WA7 5RE
- Phone:
- 01928 564069
- Email:
- toocooks@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window