Trustees LET'S GO STROKE CLUB
Charity number: 1079932

Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Veronica Cook | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Mike Duncan | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rigby | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Cook | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Byrne | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Ryder | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.