CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MEDWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acting as an umbrella organisation, and voice, for the Christian Churches in the Medway area. Organising and supporting joint Christian events throughout the area. Providing a forum for facilitating the working together of churches and para - church organisations in the Medway Area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Medway
- Ukraine
Governance
- 28 April 2000: Standard registration
- CTIM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BELLO | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|||||
ROGER KIRALFY | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Luke Bacon | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Cawte | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Tolhurst | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jill Wright | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gill | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Wright | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £1.60k | £999 | £1.62k | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £514 | £3.09k | £1.79k | £1.19k | £507 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH NOVEMBER 1999, AS AMENDED 13TH APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE RUNNING OF ECUMENICAL WORSHIP, EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES IN THE MEDWAY AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
MEDWAY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
RCCG Victorious Family
Parish Abundant Life Arena
Dock Road
CHATHAM
Kent
ME4 4TX
- Phone:
- 01634920491
- Email:
- chair@medwaychurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window