EVANGELICAL CHURCH WINNING ALL (ECWA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evangelical Christian Worship Assembly as a charity aims to advance the Christian faith in London and other parts of United Kingdom. We are also committed to relieving persons who are in conditions of need or hardship in United Kingdom and other parts of the world as the trustees may think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Nigeria
Governance
- 18 February 2000: Standard registration
- EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN WORSHIP ASSEMBLY TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olatunde Adegboyega Abodunrin | Chair | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pastor James Olunisi | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
OLAYINKA RICHARD OKE | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON ATUNDE | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.96k | £8.42k | £19.05k | £25.17k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.67k | £8.16k | £22.20k | £25.39k | £27.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
LONDON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
26A Exning Road
LONDON
E16 4NA
- Phone:
- 07429041006
- Email:
- ecwalondon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window