HOPES - THE HOPE STREET ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To actively bring together and promote the arts, business community, education and religions in order to assist and encourage physical, cultural and economic regeneration in Liverpool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 29 March 2001: Standard registration
- 18 August 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £6.84k | £3.40k | £2.70k | £19.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.71k | £9.68k | £3.46k | £1.83k | £18.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 19 June 2009 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 19 June 2009 | 134 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 17 June 2009 | 498 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 12 December 2007 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 11 December 2007 | 309 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, DEVELOPMENT AND SUPPORT OF THE ARTS BY MEANS OF THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, MUSICAL AND THEATRICAL PERFORMANCES AND RELATED ACTIVITIES. 2) TO PRESERVE OR ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR OTHER FEATURES OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN LIVERPOOL AND IN PARTICULAR THE AREA KNOWN AS THE HOPE STREET QUARTER; AND 3) TO CARRY OUT ANY GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION CONSIDERS FIT.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window