IFISH - (THE INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION OF INSPIRATION SPIRITUALITY AND HEALING)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Switzerland
Governance
- 02 May 2002: Standard registration
- 25 June 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £5.63k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.97k | £7.98k | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 05 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 29 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 02 November 2006 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 21 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 2 OCTOBER 2000 AS 1 MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS NAMELY IN THE SERVICE OF THE PUBLIC GOOD BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF PSYCHIC SCIENCE AND SPIRITUAL HEALING AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS DEED "SPIRITUAL HEALING" SHALL MEAN THE HEALING OF THE SICK IN BODY, MIND OR SPIRIT BY MEANS OF PRAYER OR MEDIATION (WHETHER OR NOT IN THE PRESENCE OF THE PATIENT) AND THE LAYING-ON OF HANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window