FRIENDS OF ST. ANDREWS RUGBY

Charity Number: 1080382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To carry out ethical activities to raise awareness of St Andrew's Church, Rugby and to raise and to provide funding to the PCC of St Andrew's Church Rugby to help with the cost of maintenance, repair and improvement of St Andrews Parish Church and its furnishings, decorations and environs in order to enhance its involvement and activities in support of local communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RUGBY PARISH CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Edmund James Newey Chair 10 July 2020
BUTLIN AND ELBOROW HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, RUGBY
Received: On time
JOHN PATRICK O'ROURKE Trustee 10 July 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, RUGBY
Received: On time
Ian Ifor Sheppard Trustee 23 November 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, RUGBY
Received: On time
JOYCE WOODINGS Trustee 12 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £40 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Andrew's Parish Church
Church Street
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV21 3PT
Phone:
07778 974312
Website:

No information available